ROYAL AIR FORCE AIR DEFENCE RADAR MUSEUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve artefacts relating to Radar and Air Defence and to present these to the public to inform and educate. To maintain an accessible archive of all air defence and radar history matters. To open the Museum on a regularly published basis to enable any person to availthemselves of the services offered.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2022
Total income includes £2,667 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 October 1996: Standard registration
- 15 February 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1200585 THE ROYAL AIR FORCE AIR DEFENCE RADAR MUSEUM
- AIR DEFENCE RADAR MUSEUM (Working name)
- AIR DEFENCE COMMAND AND CONTROL MUSEUM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.24k | £479.02k | £34.50k | £172.20k | £133.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.64k | £104.93k | £96.32k | £103.81k | £204.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £650 | £500 | £11.63k | £20.29k | £2.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST 8TH OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A MUSEUM FOR THE EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC OF THE HISTORY OF AIR DEFENCE BATTLE MANAGEMENT AND ASSOCIATED MEMORABILIA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window