FRINTON AREA CHURCHES TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of FACT is to promote the Christian faith locally by co-operating together. we represent seven local churches and oversee the Frinton Mission and unite for a Lent services and other outreach enterprises as they occur.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 01 November 1996: Standard registration
- F A C T (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Andrew David Rose BA | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER SIMPSON | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mr Les Glasby | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.69k | £4.09k | £8.02k | £24.77k | £14.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.22k | £4.72k | £7.01k | £7.82k | £24.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, BY EVANGELISM, WITHIN THE AREA OF FRINTON -ON- SEA, ESSEX, IN PARTICULAR BY CORDINATING AND RUNNING [1] AN ANNUAL SUMMER MISSION TO CHILDREN AND ADULTS [2] AN ANNUAL SERIES OF MID- WEEK SERVICES DURING LENT BUT NOT SO AS TO MAKE EITHER COMPULSORY, OR EXCLUDING ANY OTHER EVENT OR SERIES OF EVENTS, WHICH MAY BE ADOPTED BY FACT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE,FRINTON ON SEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2 Westbury Court
Harold Road
Frinton on Sea
CO13 9BE
- Phone:
- 01255671474
- Email:
- les.glasby@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window