BASINGSTOKE LADIES CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The choir become involved in various charitable purposes and do various concerts to enable other charities and voluntary bodies to raise funds for various causes. The also put on concerts for the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Hampshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 29 October 1996: Standard registration
- Hampshire Harmony (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Corrine Hutchins | Chair | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carey Stovold | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Charlesworth | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Barlin | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Messer | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.75k | £11.14k | £9.17k | £13.68k | £15.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.43k | £7.39k | £10.93k | £13.21k | £20.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/10/1995 AS AMENDED ON 12/10/1996 AS AMENDED ON 03/12/2012 AS AMENDED ON 08 JUL 2021 as amended on 19 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
1) SHALL BE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE. 2) TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Kenilworth Road
BASINGSTOKE
Hampshire
RG23 8JA
- Phone:
- 07979187540
- Email:
- info@hampshireharmony.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window