Accounts and annual returns ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF SCARBROUGH COURT

Charity number: 1058919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 14 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 14 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 10 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 08 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 February 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required