Financial history SKERTON (LANCASTER) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1058920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £103.97k £76.15k £122.08k £104.68k £89.05k
Total expenditure £82.64k £73.01k £92.96k £111.59k £101.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.56k £40.80k N/A N/A N/A