INFOCUS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of persons with a visual impairment (VI) by; - supporting the education and training of persons with VI by such means as the Trustees think fit, including (but not limited to) the provision of a school(s) and further education college(s) - providing care for persons with VI and support for them to live independently within the community - supporting the employment of persons with VI
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£9,785,382
Donations and legacies | £307.02k | |
Charitable activities | £8.84m | |
Other trading activities | £423.52k | |
Investments | £65.14k | |
Other | £146.38k |
Total expenditure:
£10,104,439
Raising funds | £311.21k | |
Charitable activities | £9.79m | |
Other | £0 |
£127,679 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £7,124,082 from 36 government contract(s) and £36,465 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £311.21k | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.79m |
People

240 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
83 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
- Torbay
Governance
- 24 August 2009: Standard registration
- 20 September 2022: Removed (Removed by application)
- INFOCUS CHARITY (WEST OF ENGLAND) (Previous name)
- THE WEST OF ENGLAND SCHOOL - THE WEST OF ENGLAND COLLEGE (Previous name)
- THE WEST OF ENGLAND SCHOOL AND COLLEGE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LITTLE OR NO SIGHT (Previous name)
- WESC FOUNDATION - THE SPECIALIST CENTRE FOR VISUAL IMPAIRMENT (Previous name)
- WEST OF ENGLAND SCHOOL FOR CHILDREN WITH LITTLE OR NO SIGHT (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Marie Marsden | Chair | 10 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Alika Gupta | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Lisa Maunder | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Harvey | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH HOLT | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Donohue MBE | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Daniel | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angus Martin McNicol | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Derek John Fargher | Trustee | 08 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.43m | £7.75m | £8.33m | £9.11m | £9.79m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.09m | £7.94m | £7.96m | £9.22m | £10.10m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £6.02m | £5.79m | £6.35m | £6.46m | £7.12m | |
|
Income from government grants | £68.69k | £51.33k | £40.15k | £52.24k | £36.47k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £31.96k | £721.19k | £195.02k | £496.66k | £307.02k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £290.88k | £191.23k | £304.73k | £366.92k | £423.52k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.78m | £6.64m | £7.62m | £8.04m | £8.84m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.37k | £45.68k | £30.74k | £57.99k | £65.14k | |
|
Income - Other | £321.15k | £151.10k | £187.74k | £154.65k | £146.38k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £410.53k | £50.50k | £354.07k | £225.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.83m | £7.69m | £7.72m | £8.97m | £9.79m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £263.84k | £245.77k | £240.65k | £252.85k | £311.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £28.01k | £15.64k | £29.99k | £30.70k | £35.89k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £128.91k | £98.61k | £110.12k | £127.91k | £148.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.08m | £6.67m | £6.81m | £6.75m | £6.72m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.52m | £1.66m | £1.23m | £1.20m | £1.33m | |
|
Other assets | £1.22m | £1.40m | £2.19m | £2.65m | £2.06m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £502.93k | £466.49k | £633.69k | £1.15m | £901.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 JUN 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 APR 2022
Charitable objects
1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH A VISION IMPAIRMENT AND COMPLEX NEEDS (WHETHER THIS IS A PHYSICAL, OTHER SENSORY OR COGNITIVE IMPAIRMENT) BY: 1.1. SUPPORTING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS WITH A VISION OR OTHER SENSORY IMPAIRMENT BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF A DAY AND RESIDENTIAL EDUCATION FACILITY; 1.2. PROVIDING CARE FOR PERSONS WITH A VISION OR OTHER SENSORY IMPAIRMENT AND SUPPORT FOR THEM TO LIVE INDEPENDENTLY IN THE COMMUNITY; 1.3. SUPPORTING THE EMPLOYMENT OF PERSONS WITH A VISION IMPAIRMENT OR OTHER SENSORY COMPLEX IMPAIRMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Linked charities
- 24 August 2009 : Standard registration
- 20 September 2022 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
InFocus Charity
Countess Wear
Topsham Road
EXETER
EX2 6HA
- Phone:
- 01392 454200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window