Trustees INFOCUS CHARITY

Charity number: 1058937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN ELIZABETH HOLT Chair 18 October 2023
None on record
Steven Stewart Bailey Trustee 20 May 2025
None on record
James Gaisford Trustee 20 May 2025
None on record
Clare Louise Doble Trustee 20 May 2025
None on record
Alika Gupta Trustee 11 February 2025
RED BALLOON LEARNER CENTRE READING
Received: On time
Lisa Maunder Trustee 24 September 2024
None on record
Christopher Harvey Trustee 24 September 2024
None on record
Ian James Donohue MBE Trustee 04 May 2023
None on record
Dr Andrew Daniel Trustee 15 July 2021
None on record
Derek John Fargher Trustee 08 December 2015
None on record