MICHAELS LIMITED

Charity Number: 1058938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Operation of Michael House providing accommodation for homeless men and women. Preventing homelessness by early intervention. Rebuilding lives. Promoting opportunities for independent living.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £451,805
Total expenditure: £383,464

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bournemouth
  • Dorset
  • Poole

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 October 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Malins Trustee 05 January 2017
None on record
Jane Kelly Trustee 06 January 2016
THE FRIENDS OF BOSCOMBE CHINE GARDENS
Received: On time
WEST HOWE COMMUNITY ENTERPRISES
Received: On time
FERNHEATH PLAY
Received: On time
MARTIN GEORGE SLADE Trustee 02 September 2015
THE LODGE OF HENGIST NO. 195 MASONIC CHARITIES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Nicholas Simon Beal Trustee 01 November 2013
None on record
Mary Elizabeth Randell Trustee 01 November 2013
None on record
helen christina hender Trustee 01 November 2013
None on record
ROSEMARIE EDITH VEALE Trustee
None on record
JOHN ALBAN HORATIO NELSON COULSTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £448.89k £382.50k £402.56k £431.16k £451.81k
Total expenditure £333.84k £331.76k £330.33k £388.09k £383.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.50k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 02 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 12 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
46 Grosvenor Gardens
BOURNEMOUTH
BH1 4HH
Phone:
01202 393178