BRISTOL CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Religious activities to lead people to Jesus
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 30 October 1996: Standard registration
- BRISTOL CHINESE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yuet Yi Ho | Chair | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wai Sun Wilson Tam | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pak Keung Pang | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chiu Ha Li | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wing Leung Wong | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.10k | £109.46k | £125.79k | £165.04k | £200.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.71k | £92.04k | £88.56k | £132.79k | £166.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
28 February 2021
(These accounts |
23 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1990 AS AMENDED JUNE 1993, 24 MARCH 1996, 14 JUNE 1996, 1 SEPTEMBER 1996, 10 OCTOBER 1999, 26 MARCH 2000 AND 16 JULY 2006 as amended on 29 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO PREACH THE GOSPEL AND MAKE DISCIPLES OF JESUS CHRIST, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO THE CHINESE COMMUNITY IN BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Area of benefit
BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Upper Stone Close
Frampton Cotterell
BRISTOL
BS36 2LB
- Phone:
- 07917619061
- Email:
- bristolccc.uk@bristolccc.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window