Governing document BRISTOL CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH
Charity number: 1058943

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1990 AS AMENDED JUNE 1993, 24 MARCH 1996, 14 JUNE 1996, 1 SEPTEMBER 1996, 10 OCTOBER 1999, 26 MARCH 2000 AND 16 JULY 2006 as amended on 29 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO PREACH THE GOSPEL AND MAKE DISCIPLES OF JESUS CHRIST, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO THE CHINESE COMMUNITY IN BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.