FRIENDS OF YARDLEY GOBION SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1059019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising for the benefit of Yardley Gobion School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 November 2023

Total income: £4,640
Total expenditure: £2,312

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 November 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF THE SCHOOL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Natalie Goodger Chair 01 November 2023
None on record
Charlene Barnard Trustee 08 December 2022
None on record
Eve Robinson Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/11/2019 01/11/2020 01/11/2021 01/11/2022 01/11/2023
Total gross income £4.15k £1.99k £2.42k £5.03k £4.64k
Total expenditure £3.73k £2.47k £2.97k £3.98k £2.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 November 2023 15 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2022 08 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2021 10 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2020 15 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2019 28 September 2020 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Vicarage Road
Yardley Gobion
TOWCESTER
NN12 7UN
Phone:
01908543544
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available