Trustees BRISTOL LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1059022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Ellerton Trustee 11 March 2025
None on record
Allison Charlotte Lewis Trustee 11 March 2025
None on record
Emmeline Davies Trustee 28 January 2025
None on record
Benjamin David Haslett Trustee 26 November 2024
None on record
Piotr Lisowski Trustee 24 September 2024
None on record
Toby Fisher Trustee 24 September 2024
None on record
Nicky Auguste Trustee 06 December 2023
STAR HOUSING
Received: 40 days late
Dr Hannah Pearce Trustee 26 September 2023
None on record
Christian Carter Trustee 26 September 2023
None on record
Emma Louise Harvey Trustee 27 September 2022
None on record
Jill Valerie Walsh Trustee 27 September 2022
None on record