PROBATION SERVICE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer Christian care and concern in the criminal justice services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 November 1996: Standard registration
- C I P (Working name)
- CHRISTIANS IN PROBATION (Working name)
- P S C F (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON MAY | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Ann Louise Williams | Trustee | 02 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Paula Mclean | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||
JEAN MARGARET JENNER | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Jacqui Burch | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LESLIE NUTTALL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176 | £172 | £283 | £286 | £75 | |
|
Total expenditure | £651 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 MAY 1991 AS AMENDED 8 JUNE 1996,AS AMENDED 8TH NOVEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE CHRISTIAN RELIGION WITHIN THE PROBATION SERVICE 2) TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION(S) AT SUCH TIME(S) AS THE FELLOWSHIP MAY IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 The Parkway
Bassett
Southampton
Southampton
Hampshire
SO16 3PQ
- Phone:
- 07714 102775
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window