Financial history THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WRITERS GROUPS

Charity number: 1059047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £20.18k £6.20k £23.81k £16.28k £7.48k
Total expenditure £18.11k £2.34k £20.48k £21.78k £6.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A