NORWOOD RAVENSWOOD

Charity number: 1059050
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Norwood supports vulnerable children and their families, and young people and adults with learning disabilities and autism. Norwood transforms lives to enable thousands of people from diverse and mixed backgrounds, grow, learn and reach their full potential. Jewish communal values are at the heart of Norwood?s services and depth of Norwood?s work in the community is truly unique.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 September 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • NORWOOD (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Miles Jason Webber Chair 15 August 2023
THE SYLVIA WEBBER TRUST
Received: On time
THE BUBBLE THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
NORWOOD SCHOOLS LTD
Received: On time
Tania Marcus Trustee 17 February 2025
None on record
Sarah Lucy Sultman Trustee 31 October 2024
None on record
Allyson Renee Abel Trustee 29 October 2024
None on record
Cassy Martell Trustee 26 September 2023
None on record
Dr Mark Orlin Berelowitz Trustee 15 August 2023
None on record
Benjamin Elliot Freeman Trustee 19 May 2021
NORWOOD SCHOOLS LTD
Received: On time
SUSSEX TIKVAH
Received: On time
THE HOPE CHARITY
Received: On time
Timothy Keith Isaacs Trustee 21 October 2020
NORWOOD SCHOOLS LTD
Received: On time
THE HOPE CHARITY
Received: On time
Justine Helen Harris Trustee 21 April 2020
None on record
Rachael Lee Davis-Stollar Trustee 31 January 2020
None on record
Glynnis Joffe Trustee 16 March 2018
None on record
Tamara Finkelstein Trustee 16 March 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.23m £33.07m £28.76m £27.71m £34.05m
Total expenditure £33.17m £32.19m £30.78m £31.32m £32.15m
Income from government contracts £19.43m £19.38m £19.04m £17.39m £21.64m
Income from government grants £20.00k £1.17m £656.00k £18.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £9.60m £9.12m £8.52m £7.99m £9.71m
Income - Other trading activities £568.00k £472.00k £321.00k £231.00k £168.00k
Income - Charitable activities £19.43m £19.38m £19.04m £18.57m £23.02m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £883.00k £953.00k £875.00k £918.00k £1.15m
Income - Other £755.00k £3.14m £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.50m £1.41m £1.60m £922.00k £3.40m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £29.08m £29.02m £28.38m £28.03m £28.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.22m £2.28m £2.16m £2.96m £3.19m
Expenditure - Governance £448.00k £348.00k £385.00k £310.00k £320.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £18.00k £0 £15.00k £13.00k £7.00k
Expenditure - Other £875.00k £884.00k £234.00k £325.00k £194.00k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £24.45m £22.33m £22.12m £21.45m £20.21m
Long-term investments £21.84m £23.47m £27.16m £25.70m £24.57m
Other assets £4.61m £9.10m £6.94m £3.48m £8.69m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £8.64m £9.11m £8.75m £8.18m £7.34m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED ON 24 SEPTEMBER 1965 AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AND DATED 22 AUGUST 2007.
Charitable objects
FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND EDUCATION OF POOR JEWISH CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 13 September 2007 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
NORWOOD
BROADWAY HOUSE
80-82 THE BROADWAY
STANMORE
HA7 4HB
Phone:
02088098809