Accounts and annual returns SOCIETY FOR EFFECTIVE AFFECTIVE LEARNING
Charity number: 1059055
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2008 | 07 August 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | 27 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | 27 July 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 30 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | 15 September 2006 | 15 days late | |
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | 25 July 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | 25 July 2005 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window