Financial history THE CHESTER LINK

Charity number: 1059064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £824.23k £1.10m £1.37m £1.52m £1.75m
Total expenditure £796.42k £1.03m £1.37m £1.59m £1.66m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £26.62k £41.51k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £922 £1.59k £5.71k £843 £566
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £823.30k £1.07m £1.33m £1.52m £1.75m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2 £0 £0 £203 £519
Income - Other £0 £26.62k £41.51k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £796.42k £1.03m £1.37m £1.59m £1.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.79k £10.06k £10.05k £13.93k £24.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0