Financial history THE A.M. PERRY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1059073
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/07/2020 01/07/2021 01/07/2022 01/07/2023 01/07/2024
Total gross income £13.96k £9.33k £14.20k £15.32k £26.41k
Total expenditure £29.83k £11.30k £26.54k £6.19k £25.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A