M.U.M.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Set up of our educational project Provision of masterclasses for able children, summer schools for children falling behind. Provision of Sports and recreational activities usually unaccessible to children due to financial status of parents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Newham
- Tower Hamlets
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 08 November 1996: Standard registration
- AL FATIHA (Working name)
- AL FATIHA MUSLIM WOMENS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Hall | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gregory George Hall | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND SEPTEMBER 1996, AND AMENDED 14TH OCTOBER 1996 as amended on 03 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ISLAM 2. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF FEMALE INHABITANTS AND CHILDREN OF HACKNEY. 3. TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION FOR MUSLIM WOMEN. 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF PRE-SCHOOL AGE BY THE PROVISION OF NURSERY AND PRE-SCHOOL EDUCATION DURING TERM TIME AND HOLIDAYS.
Area of benefit
HACKNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
72
Norlington Road
E10 6LA
- Phone:
- 07960550660
- Email:
- cityprojectltd@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window