TANNERS WOOD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
fund raising from parents and local community for school equipment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
56 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 14 November 1996: Standard registration
- Friends of Tanners Wood (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kiri Tish | Chair | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Chaplin | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Smiith | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Thackham | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.63k | £6.64k | £27.23k | £25.16k | £18.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.08k | £7.70k | £13.92k | £22.96k | £36.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2022
(These accounts |
18 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9/10/96
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED , IN PRACTICE ABBOTS LANGLEY/HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tanners Wood Junior & Infant School
Hazelwood Lane
Abbots Langley
WD5 0LG
- Phone:
- 01923262229
- Email:
- friendsoftanners@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window