GREATER MANCHESTER SPORTS PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GreaterSport is a Greater Manchester charity committed to changing lives through moving more, sport and physical activity. We play a strategic leadership role in support of GM Moving, the Greater Manchester wide movement, for movement. We lead, support and connect the Greater Manchester system in creating the conditions to enable Active Lives for All.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,994,972
Donations and legacies | £1.05m | |
Charitable activities | £1.83m | |
Other trading activities | £705 | |
Investments | £113.97k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,150,799
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.15m | |
Other | £0 |
£16,037 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £2,880,293 from 12 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.15m |
People

34 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 11 November 1996: Standard registration
- GREATERSPORT (Working name)
- GREATER MANCHESTER YOUTH GAMES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Perls MBE | Chair | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Irozuru | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jill Harrison | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Edward Baker | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Pleasant MBE | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Carr MBE | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Leanne Feeley | Trustee | 13 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dan Cropper | Trustee | 08 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Warren Heppolette | Trustee | 13 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Brown-Fraser | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rob Mukherjee | Trustee | 24 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.47m | £2.50m | £2.73m | £3.55m | £2.99m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.20m | £2.49m | £2.97m | £3.47m | £3.15m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.27m | £2.38m | £2.63m | £3.53m | £2.88m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £511.64k | £512.14k | £526.78k | £995.05k | £1.05m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £12.68k | £10.99k | £12.09k | £705 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.89m | £1.96m | £2.19m | £2.54m | £1.83m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £7.66k | £10.69k | £1.71k | £7.89k | £113.97k | |
|
Income - Other | £63.37k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.20m | £2.49m | £2.97m | £3.47m | £3.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.65k | £10.88k | £9.07k | £10.44k | £14.09k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.09m | £664.56k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.06k | £2.03k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £216.04k | |
|
Other assets | £2.06m | £2.09m | £2.03m | £2.29m | £1.42m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £212.27k | £226.71k | £403.68k | £577.14k | £273.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/10/1996 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/02/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 OCT 2017 as amended on 26 Jul 2023 as amended on 24 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
for the benefit of the inhabitants of Greater Manchester and surrounding neighbourhood, to promote community participation in healthy recreation including sport, social and cultural activities, and in particular by: • promoting and enabling increased levels of participation in physical activity and sport; • encouraging sporting, recreational, and other leisure time activities that promote health and wellbeing; • the provision of recreational and social facilities and opportunities for the public at large or those who, by reason of their age, disability, social and economic circumstances or protected characteristics, have need of such facilities; • the improvement and preservation of good health and wellbeing through engagement in active lives.
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greater Manchester Moving
House of Sport
Rowsley Street
Manchester
M11 3FF
- Phone:
- 07740883084
- Email:
- office@gmmoving.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window