Accounts and annual returns THE CHARITABLE FUNDS OF CHARING CROSS, HAMMERSMITH AND QUEEN CHARLOTTE'S HOSPITALS

Charity Number: 1059138
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 11 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 11 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 22 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 21 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 01 February 2007 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 01 February 2007 1 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 27 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 27 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 11 April 2005 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 25 February 2005 25 days late