ELECTRONIC IMMIGRATION NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EIN's charitable objectives are to advance the education of the public by the improvement and diffusion of knowledge of and information about all aspects of immigration, nationality and asylum law.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £72,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 November 1996: Standard registration
- EIN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY MCINDOE | Chair | 31 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Adam Pipe | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rheba Helene Glazier | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jones | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GEOFFREY CARE | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
DENISE MCDOWELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.00k | £203.74k | £191.94k | £201.77k | £219.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.61k | £205.96k | £151.66k | £183.43k | £200.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £65.00k | £65.00k | £68.00k | £72.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/11/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/01/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/10/2011 as amended on 12 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE IMPROVEMENT AND DIFFUSION OF KNOWLEDGE OF AND INFORMATION ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF IMMIGRATION,NATIONALITY AND REFUGEE LAW AND PRACTICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 116
Regus
St James Tower
7 Charlotte Street
Manchester
LANCS
- Phone:
- 01615219831
- Email:
- admin@ein.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window