THE DUDSON CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity owns the freehold of a voluntary sector resource centre providing facilities to voluntary sector organisations. The bottle oven on the site houses a museum which is open to the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 13 November 1996: Standard registration
- DUDSON CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN JAMES DUDSON CBE | Chair |
|
||||||
Richard Denis Mounsey | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joy Hancock | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Karen Milton | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
KERRY SHEA | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARK BARNISH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.63k | £68.79k | £51.25k | £43.70k | £34.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.14k | £74.44k | £53.91k | £23.46k | £47.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 MARCH 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 24 APRIL 1996 AND 17 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
1) TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE TOWNSPEOPLE IN THE CITY OF STOKE-ON-TRENT IN THE COUNTY OF STAFFORDSHIRE AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE WHATEVER OF THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THAT CITY IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST 2) TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN STOKE-ON-TRENT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS
Area of benefit
STOKE-ON-TRENT IN THE COUNTY OF STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Dudson Centre
Hope Street
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST1 5DD
- Phone:
- 07778435715
- Email:
- rgraham.hill@uwclub.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window