FLYABILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Flyability does not simply take people with disabilities flying, but strives to motivate people with disabilities to become involved in the sport of hang gliding and paragliding and to train as pilots. Flyability encourages people with disabilities to train at the BHPA school of their choice - alongside able-bodied student pilots (where possible).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 November 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGE RANSOME | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Charles Richardson | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIMON WHITE | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LYSAGHT | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARC NIGEL ASQUITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN PATRICK GLANDORE CROSBIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.55k | £2.62k | £497 | £4.54k | £831 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.49k | £101 | £1.31k | £2.69k | £1.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED 6 SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS TO PARTICIPATE IN THE SPORT OF HANG GLIDING, PARAGLIDING AND ANY OTHER RELATED FORMS OF FLIGHT, WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE EXECUTIVE COUNCIL OF THE BRITISH HANG GLIDING AND PARAGLIDING ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
British Gliding Association
8 Merus Court
Meridian Business Park
LEICESTER
LE19 1RJ
- Phone:
- 01162894316
- Email:
- contact@flyability.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window