Financial history BANBURY CROSS ROUND TABLE

Charity Number: 1059219
Charity reporting is overdue by 1570 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £20.58k £19.09k £14.42k £14.26k £18.22k
Total expenditure £15.00k £10.19k £12.86k £8.36k £11.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A