BANBURY CROSS ROUND TABLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local fundraising activities with a Santa Sleigh and other charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 14 November 1996: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 03 May 2017: Re-registered
- 13 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 September 2017: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Barton Round | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Langston | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Jupe | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.58k | £19.09k | £14.42k | £14.26k | £18.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.00k | £10.19k | £12.86k | £8.36k | £11.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 MAY 1996
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c.o. Walford & Round
47 High Street
BANBURY
OX16 5LA
- Phone:
- 01295262501
- Email:
- BANBURY@ROUNDTABLE.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window