Governing document CHURCH OF GOD - UNITED KINGDOM
Charity Number: 1059248

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION OF 23 SEPTEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 11 NOVEMBER 1996, 6 DEC 1998, 03 JUNE 2007 AND 23 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION BY PREACHING THROUGHOUT THE WORLD THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND THE KINGDOM OF GOD AND TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.