THE BOSHAM BURIAL GROUND ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian religion by maintaining and repairing the burial ground of Holy Trinity Church, Bosham, Chichester, West Sussex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 15 November 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elizabeth Weller | Chair | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Rosalind Bowen | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Stephen James Phillips | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Francis Declan Finbar Tempany McCormack BA | Trustee | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Diana Margaret Baker | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Joan Langhorne | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
WENDY LESLIE WHITTLE | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|||||||||
JUDITH HELEN STERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
GAIL POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Canon Martin John Lane | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.34k | £6.43k | £6.02k | £5.77k | £7.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.75k | £4.54k | £5.64k | £4.68k | £6.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 05 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 OCTOBER 1996 as amended on 14 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY MAINTAINING AND REPAIRING THE HOLY TRINITY CHURCH,BOSHAM'S BURIAL GROUND
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE,BOSHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
WATERMEADOW
SMUGGLERS LANE
BOSHAM
CHICHESTER
PO18 8QW
- Phone:
- 01243572821
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window