Financial history CARDIFF YEMENI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1059257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.79k £2.27k £26.59k £17.64k £24.09k
Total expenditure £4.77k £2.48k £9.91k £28.83k £25.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £12.71k N/A N/A