THE ANCIENT PARISH OF BARWICK-IN-ELMET TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty within the Ancient Parish of Barwick in Elmet
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leeds City
Governance
- 18 November 1996: Standard registration
- THE ANCIENT PARISH OF BARWICK-IN-ELMET CHARITY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr STELLA M WALSH | Chair | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ZOE GILLIAN BAGLEY | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE WARD | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JOHN SOUTH | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ALAN LEEMING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.87k | £4.34k | £2.65k | £4.97k | £6.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.27k | £4.64k | £3.13k | £8.52k | £13.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 28 January 2025 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 04 January 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 31 December 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 23 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OF INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED,HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF BARWICK-IN-ELMET INCLUDING SCHOLES, PARTS OF CROSS GATES, SWARCLIFFE, PARTS OF WHINMOOR, FEARNVILLE, OAKWOOD AND LADYWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 FLATS LANE
BARWICK IN ELMET
LEEDS
LS15 4LJ
- Phone:
- 01132813554
- Email:
- daleeming@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window