Trustees QUAKER ACTION ON ALCOHOL AND DRUGS
Charity number: 1059310

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JON LYON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Robert Wilson | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Tomlinson | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Benjamin Misell | Trustee | 02 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Clarke Flynn | Trustee | 02 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Bewley | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Barry | Trustee | 10 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE PRYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIM JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EVA DEREGOWSKA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.