WISTANSTOW OVER 60'S
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting people who are over 60 years of age in the Parish of Wistanstow, Shropshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 21 November 1996: Standard registration
- 31 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 31 January 2018: Funds transferred to 243003 WISTANSTOW VILLAGE HALL
- WINSTANSTOW OVER 60'S (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2013 | 28/02/2014 | 28/02/2015 | 28/02/2016 | 28/02/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.53k | £1.74k | £1.78k | £3.61k | £271 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.30k | £1.54k | £1.35k | £1.50k | £1.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2017 | 26 January 2018 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2016 | 01 February 2017 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2015 | 27 January 2016 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2014 | 22 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MARCH 1996
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CLUB SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE PARISH OF WINSTANSTOW
Area of benefit
WINSTANSTOW
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window