B.A.T. (BATTLING ADDICTIONS TOGETHER)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advice, advocacy and support for people in recovery from alcohol and drug problems.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Hounslow
Governance
- 22 November 1996: Standard registration
- 15 March 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 15 March 2019: Funds transferred to 1058819 ACTON HOMELESS CONCERN (EMMAUS HOUSE AND DAMIEN CE...
- BATTLING ALCOHOLISM TOGETHER (Working name)
- B.A.T. (BATTLING ALCOHOL TOGETHER) (Previous name)
- EX-PATIENTS' ASSOCIATION-MAXGLATT UNIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | £2.73k | £3.72k | £1.05k | £150 | |
|
Total expenditure | £948 | £2.36k | £4.03k | £950 | £310 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 03 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 08 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 09 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 14 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/7/96 AMENDED 5/11/96
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG THOSE PERSONS AFFECTED BY ADDICTION TO ALCOHOL, NARCOTIC DRUGS AND OTHER SIMILAR SUBSTANCES OR COMPOUND OF POSSIBLE POTENTIAL OR SUSPECTED DANGER TO THE INDIVIDUAL AND TO THE COMMUNITY [ HEREAFTER REFERRED TO AS "DRUGS" ] IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT, COUNSELLING, TO BOTH BENEFICIAL CLASS AND THEIR FAMILIES, PARTNERS OR RELATIVES RESPONSIBLE FOR THEIR CARE.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window