COVENANT PLAYERS UK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Covenant Players is an international Christian repertory theatre company. We are a communications and educational resource, providing performances and training in service to the church, schools, prisons and diverse organisations across the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- France
- Germany
- Ireland
- Luxembourg
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 November 1996: Standard registration
- COVENANT PLAYERS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEBORAH CHRISTINE ALLEN | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN LOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY LLOYD MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN M JOHNSON-TANNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.38k | £25.17k | £25.40k | £30.40k | £34.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.47k | £23.43k | £28.24k | £31.26k | £35.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 30TH OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE OF THE DEED HERETO PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE PRODUCTION AND PERFORMANCE OF DRAMA ND OTHER MEDIA TO PROMOTE CHRISTAIN TEACHINGS, PRINCIPLES, VALUES AND MORES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY IN THE AREA OF RELIGIOUS BELIEFS AND MORES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Lon Gwenant
Pontrhydyrun
CWMBRAN
Gwent
NP44 1FD
- Phone:
- 07949 645 838
- Email:
- cp.bio@covenantplayers.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window