THE CHELMSFORD AND DISTRICT GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Giving practical road safety advice and guidance to prepare drivers to take the The Institute of Advanced Motorists Advanced driving test. 2. Provide speakers to give road safety talks to interested bodies and recruit members of the public for activity 1 (above). 3. Produce an informative Group newsletter for all Group Members with road safety advice, tips and news.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 25 November 1996: Standard registration
- CHELMSFORD ADVANCED MOTORISTS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andy Nicholson | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Les McDonald | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pat Clements | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jen Maclellan | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Desmond Shillingford | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frank Ferguson | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mick Gilbert | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Kentish | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM LOWE | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Terry Hyland | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JOHNSTON | Trustee | 20 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE ALBERT JOYCE | Trustee | 01 June 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.40k | £4.05k | £3.06k | £3.19k | £3.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.25k | £1.37k | £2.60k | £2.53k | £2.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND REGULATIONS ADOPTED 20/9/96
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE STANDARD OF DRIVING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY.
Area of benefit
CHELMSFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Church Close
Wickham Bishops
Witham
CM8 3LN
- Phone:
- 07714 566253
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window