THE VISCOUNT RIDLEY NORTH OF ENGLAND CADET FORCES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist cadets in the North East of England from disadvantaged backgrounds wishing to undertake adventure, sporting and leadership activities which will help them develop their life skills, mature and reach their true potentials, so that they can become useful members of society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- Redcar And Cleveland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 21 November 1996: Standard registration
- 25 August 2020: Funds received from 224491 THE LONDONDERRY HALL TRUST
- THE NORTH OF ENGLAND CADET FORCES TRUST (Previous name)
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COL GLENTON | Chair |
|
||||||||||||
Richard Reed | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ingrid Moir | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Elizabeth Alison Green | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Varn Bhushan Jassal TD JP DL | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Brigadier Paul Joseph Baker OBE | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
HARRY LOWE | Trustee | 10 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.76k | £246.56k | £27.35k | £33.70k | £34.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.87k | £33.10k | £23.48k | £44.98k | £26.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18/10/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 24/04/2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF CADETS SERVING IN EITHER THE SEA CADET CORPS, THE ROYAL MARINE CADETS, THE ARMY CADET FORCE OR THE AIR TRAINING CORPS WITHIN THE ASSOCIATION AREA IN A) MAKING GRANTS TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF CADETS INCLUDING THOSE WHOSE PARENTS OR GUARDAINS ARE OR MAY BE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES TO ENABLE THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITITES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY BY ATTENDING CAMPS COURSES AND TRAINING AND TO PARTICIPATE IN SPORTS GAMES COMPETITIONS EXEDITIONS AND OTHER ADVENTUROUS TRAINING AND ACTIVITIES AND TO INCLUDE (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) MAKING GRANTS FOR THE PRUCHASE OF SUITABLE CLOTHING AND EQUIPMENT FOR SUCH PURPOSES AND TO ASSIST WITH TRAVEL EXPENSES AND INSURANCE B) IN MAKING GRANTS TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND WELFARE OF THE UNITS SUB UINITS COMPANIES WINGS DETACHEMENTS AND AQUADRONS OF THE AFORESAID CADET ORGANISATIONS BY IMPROVING THE FACILITIES AND AMENITIES OF TRAINING AND SERVICE C) IN MAKING GRANTS IN SUPPORT OF OR DONATIONS TO ANY OTHER CHARITABLE TRUST WHICH MAY EXIST FROM TIME TO TIME FOR THE BENEFIT OF CADET FORCES GENERALLY
Area of benefit
NORTH OF ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE NORTH OF ENGLAND CADET FORCES T
53 OLD ELVET
DURHAM
DH1 3JJ
- Phone:
- 01913836253
- Email:
- ne-cedep@rfca.mod.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window