WHEAT MENTOR SUPPORT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In furthering the aims & vision described on the charity's website. WHEAT mentor support trust runs workshops, provides training, research and consultancy services; provides mentoring; and raises funds. For children and young people, it provides coaching in basketball and table tennis, teaches dance, art and gardening just to mention a few. Also promotes healthy eating & environmental awareness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
- Ethiopia
- Sudan
- Uganda
Governance
- 22 November 1996: Standard registration
- WHEAT MENTOR SUPPORT (Working name)
- WHEAT AGRO-INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH AND CONSULTANCY TRUST (Previous name)
- WHEAT AGRO-INDUSTRIAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tamirat Bekele | Chair | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mike Hailu Gebre Yohannes | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR Amare Desta PhD | Trustee | 28 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Senay Nega | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MALUKO MAHAMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Naglaa Sadik Ahmed Mustafa | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00k | £1.74k | £10.86k | £597 | £9.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00k | £0 | £4.29k | £5.72k | £7.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/03/1995 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23/02/2014
Charitable objects
1 TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH WHICH HELPS TO ALLEVIATE NEED IN AFRICA BY CONSIDERING THE BEST USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES IN IMPROVING THE SELF SUFFICIENCY OF THE INDIGENOUS PEOPLE. 2 TO ASSIST IN IMPLEMENTING AND ESTABLISHING DEVELOPMENT PROJECTS. 3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS AND MIGRANTS IN THE UK, PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FROM AFRICA, AND TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPACITY AND SKILLS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM NECESSARY WITH A VIEW TO ASSISTING SUCH PERSONS TO INTEGRATE MORE FULLY INTO SOCIETY
Area of benefit
UK AND AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMUNITY AFRICAN NETWORK
HALKEVI COMMUNITY CENTRE
31 Dalston Lane
LONDON
E8 3DF
- Phone:
- 07847578556
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window