THE CLIO TRUST

Charity number: 1059390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

It is the trustees' policy to distribute approximately one year's income in the course of each financial year and to retain as a reserve only sufficient to be able to respond expeditiously and when appropriate to urgent appeals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £7,732
Total expenditure: £3,276

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 November 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM LAWRENCE GREENWELL SWAN Trustee
THE SIR JAMES AND LADY SCOTT TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID ROBARTS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE GRAVELINES TRUST
Received: On time
THE HANLEY TRUST (1987)
Received: On time
THE WORKER TRUST
Received: On time
SCOTT BOLTON TRUST
Received: 23 days late
THE LEVER TRUST
Received: On time
THE JK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CLIPPER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE WYNKCOOMBE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SIR DEREK GREENAWAY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE DRANDJEAW CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ULANA TRUST
Received: On time
THE TINKER TRUST
Received: On time
ST ALDHELM'S CHAPEL TRUST
Received: On time
LADY OONAH SOPHIA ELLIOTT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £6.66k £132.01k £5.99k £6.63k £7.73k
Total expenditure £9.91k £135.76k £10.06k £6.30k £3.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 27 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 17 February 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
33 Queen Anne Street
LONDON
W1G 9HY
Phone:
02078022700
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available