CROSSROADS BRAINTREE AND CHELMSFORD LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main activity is to provide short breaks to unpaid carers who care for adults and children with care needs as a result of disability, illness or age. In doing so we aim to relieve some of the stress felt by being a carer whilst helping them to maintaintain their own health and well-being.We are committed to providing practical support in the home in order to enable carers to have a break.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £29,793 from 2 government contract(s) and £4,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 02 December 1996: Standard registration
- CROSSROADS CARE BRAINTREE DISTRICT AND CHELMSFORD (Working name)
- BRAINTREE AND DISTICT CROSSROADS CARE ATTENDANT SCHEME (Previous name)
- CROSSROADS CARE BRAINTREE DISTRICT AND CHELMSFORD (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharyn Griffiths | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Dove | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer McFaull | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Richardson | Trustee | 09 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN TATE | Trustee | 01 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £196.99k | £280.94k | £183.67k | £222.31k | £242.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £225.94k | £179.24k | £186.05k | £212.91k | £246.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £29.05k | £6.95k | £12.94k | £27.75k | £29.79k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £109.54k | £40.59k | £4.85k | £4.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 JULY 2009 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31 MAY 2017 as amended on 04 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS AND BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
BRAINTREE DISTRICT AND CHELMSFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crossroads
Unit 8
Park Farm
Witham Road
Black Notley
BRAINTRE
- Phone:
- 01376529985
- Website:
-
Www.crossroadsbraintreechelmsford.Co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window