CLIFTON VILLAGE NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of sessional daycare for two to four year old children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 25 November 1996: Standard registration
- CLIFTON PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP BRIGHOUSE (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Wray | Chair | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carol Cane | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Clough | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Lander | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.57k | £102.16k | £103.94k | £106.85k | £152.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.25k | £100.16k | £96.62k | £108.15k | £117.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 06 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/09/1996 AS AMENDED ON 09/10/2010
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O ST. JOHN'S PRIMARY SCHOOL
TOWNGATE
CLIFTON
BRIGHOUSE
WEST YORKSHIRE
HD6 4HP
- Phone:
- 01484719532
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window