Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST. MONICA'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1059399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 25 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 25 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 16 September 2022 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 16 September 2022 48 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 July 2022 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 29 July 2022 364 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 29 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window