RYECROFT HALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF AUDENSHAW AND THE NEIGHOURHOOD WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF TAMESIDE. TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
- Tameside
Governance
- 25 November 1996: Standard registration
- RYECROFT HALL COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS P WATKIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Maria Bailey | Trustee | 30 August 2013 |
|
|||||
COUNCILLOR TERESA SMITH | Trustee | 30 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
WENDY BRELSFORD | Trustee | 30 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS P COTTERILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR R PARTRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS M LEACH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS B REANEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS M SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.87k | £12.85k | £22.42k | £42.08k | £61.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.59k | £17.03k | £19.52k | £53.69k | £69.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.40k | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 283 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF AUDENSHAW AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF TAMESIDE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS 2) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS 3) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED
Area of benefit
AUDENSHAW AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 KERSHAW GROVE
AUDENSHAW
MANCHESTER
M34 5SH
- Phone:
- 01613707803
- Email:
- ryecrofthall@tameside.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window