Accounts and annual returns LLANBRYNMAIR COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1059447
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 April 2025 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 April 2025 65 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 February 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 March 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window