Financial history LLANBRYNMAIR COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1059447
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.54k £18.40k £16.34k £21.20k £28.89k
Total expenditure £19.54k £20.09k £19.38k £20.99k £25.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £4.64k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.00k £4.64k £13.44k £5.00k