UNITED SERVICES CATHOLIC ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 November 1996: Standard registration
- 03 February 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- U S C A (Working name)
- USCA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.08k | £4.43k | £3.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.91k | £4.41k | £3.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 31 December 2005 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 22ND OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
1.TO FOSTER THE FATIH OF ROMAN CATHOLIC MEMBERS OF HM FORCES AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH PRAYER, GOOD EXAMPLE AND THE PERSONAL COMMITMENT OF MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION AND TO AID AND ASSIST ROMAN CATHOLIC CHAPLAINS AND PRIESTS ATTACHED TO HM FORCES. 2. TO ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST FINANCIALLY SUCH CHARITABLE PROJECTS AS THE ASSOCIATION TERMS DESIRABLE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window