Trustees ASHTON KEYNES VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1059462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID JOHN SHEPPARD Chair 12 March 1998
None on record
Richard Hollamby Trustee 30 April 2025
None on record
JOHANNA TIPPING Trustee 19 February 2023
ASHTON KEYNES MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST
Received: On time
ELISABETH LILIAN MACKINNON Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
STUART ROY HARRIS Trustee 18 March 2015
None on record
DAPHNE NEALE Trustee
None on record