Financial history ALBIRR FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1059473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £427.69k £466.03k £710.71k £757.16k £791.72k
Total expenditure £436.53k £428.11k £516.17k £531.67k £579.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £641.04k £655.34k £680.83k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £10.80k £84.50k £37.20k
Income - Other N/A N/A £58.87k £17.33k £73.69k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £516.17k £531.67k £579.55k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £6.16k £6.85k £7.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £26.28k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0