Financial history SREE AYYAPPA SEVA SANGAM (LONDON)

Charity Number: 1059478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £209.28k £175.87k £151.81k £192.48k £238.87k
Total expenditure £163.24k £119.02k £135.70k £156.56k £153.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A