SREE AYYAPPA SEVA SANGAM (LONDON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVANCE AYYAPPAN FAITH TO UK COMMUNITY. HELP THE NEEDED PROVIDE SERVICE TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY YOUTH WORK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 November 1996: Standard registration
- LONDON SREE AYYAPPAN TEMPLE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUTHUKUMARU THIAGESHAPILLAI ANPAN | Chair | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
NADARAJAH LOGESWARAN | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
SENTHILRAJ MUTHIAH | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
NADARAJAH BERNARD SURESPARAN | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
NADARAJAH SIVAKUMARAN | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ATPUTHANATHAN KANGATHEEPAN | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rajja Rajagopalan | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr VICKNES VARAKADADSHAN KIRUPAALAR | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
shivanthan saravanapavananthan | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
SURESHKUMAR AMIRTHALINGAM | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUNTHARAMPILLAI KIRUBAHAR | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.28k | £175.87k | £151.81k | £192.48k | £238.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.24k | £119.02k | £135.70k | £156.56k | £153.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 17TH APRIL 1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17 DEC 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION (WORSHIP OF LORD AYYAPPA).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sree Ayyappa Seva Sangam
BROTHERHOOD HALL
36 Masons Avenue
HARROW
HA3 5AR
- Phone:
- 07888846854
- Email:
- public@londonayyappan.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window